Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Camille L Velez-Rive
Case #: 3:25-cv-01263
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 1:12 AM AST
Claimant
Luis Abraham Marrero-Santiago
Represented By
Edwin Prado-Galarza
Prado, Nunez & Associates, Psc
contact info
Respondent
USA


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM AST
Friday, May 16, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 05/16 10:08 AM
Summons Issued as to USA. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (rim)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion to Restrict Fri 05/16 9:57 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Restrict. Redacted version of the Complaint and exhibits, with personal data properly redacted due on 5/23/2025. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 05/16/2025. (CVR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 05/16 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. (rim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Exhibits Tue 05/13 7:20 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons for issuance by the Clerk pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b); Civil Cover Sheet for the Courts records;Category Sheet for the Courts records re1 Complaint, (Prado-Galarza, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Category Sheet,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, May 12, 2025
2 2 motion Restrict Mon 05/12 7:23 PM
MOTION to Restrict Document ACCESS TO DOCKET NO. 1 PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 9 AND FEDERAL PRIVACY RULES filed by Edwin Prado-Galarza on behalf of Luis Abraham Marrero-Santiago. Responses due by 5/27/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prado-Galarza, Edwin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 7:21 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***COMPLAINT DEMAND FOR RETURN OF PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. § 983 CAFRA AND THE FIFTH AMENDMENT TO THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION against USA ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-9096264.), filed by USA, Luis Abraham Marrero-Santiago. Service due by 8/11/2025,(Prado-Galarza, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-4