Russell A. Harrington v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02978 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 1:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Coporation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairway Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133 |
|
Plaintiff
Russell A. Harrington
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 05/12 2:59 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 4/8/2025), Russell A. Harrington v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02978-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District of Oregon (jbin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12376482.), filed by Russell A. Harrington. Service due by 7/7/2025 (jbin) |