David Zyble v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-03003 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 1:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions
|
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus, Inc.
180 Etowah Trace
Fayetteville, GA 30214 |
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
David Zyble
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 05/12 3:34 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 4/9/2025), David Zyble v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-03003-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western District of Michigan (jbin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin) |
|
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12377233.), filed by David Zyble. Service due by 7/8/2025 (jbin) |