Erickson v. City of Macomb, et al et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Mihm |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-04096 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2025 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/12/2025 transferring case to the Northern District of Illinois. (SB) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Mon 05/12 3:27 PM
Case electronically transferred to District of Northern District of Illinois. (SB) |
||
misc
Remark
Mon 05/12 4:36 PM
Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF NextGen 1.8 as case 1:25-cv-05249, filed 05/12/2025. (JJK) |
||
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Mon 05/12 11:40 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Petitioner Heidi K Erickson. Responses due by 5/23/2025. (SB) |
|
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Heidi K Erickson. Responses due by 5/23/2025. (SB) |
|
1 | 1
![]() PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Heidi K Erickson.(SB) |