Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Carl J Barbier
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:25-cv-00915
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause00:0000 Cause Code Unknown
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 3:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Entergy Corporation
Plaintiff
Rogers Boudreaux, Jr
Chief Little Sun 9225 Lake Forest Blvd.
New Orleans, LA 70127


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 05/13 3:12 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 5/13/2025. (rkr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 05/13 8:40 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown recused. Case reassigned to Judge Carl J Barbier. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on May 12, 2025.(mp)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 05/12 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Entergy Corporation. Summons Prepared and given to Plaintiff at Pro Se Window. (cf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Entergy Corporation (Filing fee $ 405 paid receipt no. 200012397) filed by Rogers Boudreaux, Jr.(cf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet