Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Referred: Brian Mckay
Case #: 3:25-cv-01188
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
misc Order Receipt Wed 05/14 12:26 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed May 14 12:26:26 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Wed 05/14 12:25 PM
Order and Notice of Deficiency: Vincent Pasco must address the following deficiency: He must complete and return the enclosed form for actions filed under 28 U.S.C. § 2254. He must also either pay the $5 filing fee for a habeas case or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis with the required certificate of inmate trust account or comparable form. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 5/13/2025) (axm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Form,
Att: 2 2254 Form
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 05/12 3:26 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Vincent Pasco. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (knb)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 05/12 3:26 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon May 12 15:26:45 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Mon 05/12 3:25 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (knb)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Scholer Mon 05/12 3:24 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge McKay (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]