California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:25-cv-01144
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Case in other court:Riverside Superior Court, CVRI2501610
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
RRA CP Opportunity Trust 1
Represented By
Quyen Thai
Sweeney Mason LLP
contact info
Nathaniel R Lucey
Sweeny Mason LLP
contact info
Defendant
Real Time Resolutions Inc
Represented By
Quyen Thai
Sweeney Mason LLP
contact info
Nathaniel R Lucey
Sweeny Mason LLP
contact info
Defendant
ZBS Law LLP
Plaintiff
Anthony Spence
Trustee and Beneficiary of the Gloria Spence Living Trust and Successor In Interest 16011 Regency Ranch Road
Riverside, CA 92504


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
9 9 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/12 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant RRA CP Opportunity Trust 1, (Lucey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/12 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Real Time Resolutions Inc, (Lucey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 05/12 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 4 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 05/12 9:19 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 05/12 9:06 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 05/12 9:05 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 05/12 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Mon 05/12 9:00 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to clerical error. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been reassigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. New Case Number 5:25-cv-1144 SSS SHK. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVRI2501610 Receipt No: ACACDC-39672296 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant RRA CP OPPORTUNITY TRUST 1, Real Time Resolutions Inc. (Attorney Nathaniel R Lucey added to party RRA CP OPPORTUNITY TRUST 1(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel R Lucey added to party Real Time Resolutions Inc(pty:dft))(Lucey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of N. Lucey,
Att: 2 Exhibit to Decl of N Lucey,
Att: 3 Declaration of Trakhtenbroit,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet
cmp Petition (case opening) Mon 05/12 9:15 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PETITION TO SET ASIDE TRUSTEE'S SALE AND CANCEL TRUSTEE'S DEED UPON SALE.filed against Does 1-10, Inclusive, RRA CP Opportunity Trust 1, Real Time Resolutions Inc, ZBS Law LLP, filed by plaintiff Anthony Spence. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/10/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap)
Related: [-]