California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Referred: Pslc Chc
Case #: 5:25-cv-03252
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 8:04 PM PDT
Defendant
Contra Costa County Jail Medical
Plaintiff
Terry R. Bailey
2422955 West County Detention Facility 5555 Giant Hwy
Richmond, CA 94806


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
8 8 order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/12 10:53 AM
Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 05/12 9:50 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Unsigned Complaint on Form due by 5/19/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (kxo, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re Certificate of Funds for in forma pauperis due within 28 days.Due by 5/19/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 *** DISREGARD-FILED IN ERROR. CORRECT DKT AT 6 *** CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Unsigned Complaint. Signed Complaint due within 28 days. (kxo, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 4/11/2025 (kxo, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/11/2025 (kxo, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terry R. Bailey. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 (UNSIGNED) COMPLAINT against Contra Costa County Jail Medical. Filed by Terry R. Bailey. Consent/Declination due by 5/12/2025.(kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope