Oregon District Court
Judge:Ann L Aiken
Case #: 6:25-cv-00786
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 1:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Mohammed bin Rashid Al Makton
Defendant
Fredrick Merz
Defendant
Vladimi Putin
Plaintiff
Ashley Sierra Harris
1560 Lincoln Street Unit 24
Eugene, OR 97401

GPO May 15 2025
OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP petition 2 is GRANTED but the Complaint 1 is DISMISSED with leave to amend but without service on Defendants. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days in which to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is advised that failure to submit an amended complaint within the allotted time will result in the entry of a judgment of dismissal without further notice. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel 3 is DENIED. Signed on 5/15/2025 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/15/2025.) (ck)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
6 6 5 pgs order Opinion and Order 1 - Scheduling Thu 05/15 3:58 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP petition2 is GRANTED but the Complaint1 is DISMISSED with leave to amend but without service on Defendants. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days in which to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is advised that failure to submit an amended complaint within the allotted time will result in the entry of a judgment of dismissal without further notice. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel3 is DENIED. Signed on 5/15/2025 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/15/2025.) (ck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Tue 05/13 2:16 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 5/13/2025 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/13/2025.) (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Mon 05/12 4:53 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/12/2025.) (jw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 05/12 4:52 PM
Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. Filed by Ashley Sierra Harris. (jw)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Mon 05/12 4:51 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Ashley Sierra Harris. (jw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/12 4:48 PM
Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ashley Sierra Harris against Fredrick Merz, Mohammed bin Rashid Al Makton, Vladimi Putin.. (jw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet