Texas Northern District Court
Judge:James Wesley Hendrix
Case #: 5:25-cv-00106
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:May 13, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer Thu 05/15 11:35 AM
Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties: The government is ordered to file a response to the motion no later than 60 days after the date of this Order. Thomas must file his reply brief no later than 30 days after the date of service of the government's answer, motion, or other response. A reply must be limited to the arguments raised by the government and must not include any new allegations of fact or new grounds for relief. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Thomas. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Stephen S Gilstrap-DOJ for USA added. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/15/2025) (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 05/15 11:36 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu May 15 11:36:44 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
4 4 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/14 11:05 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis , Dkt No.2 , is DENIED as unnecessary. No filing fee is required for motions under 28 U.S.C. § 2255. See Advisory Committee Notes to Rule 3 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/14/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 05/14 11:36 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Mailed copy NEF - Doc. No. 4. Wed May 14 11:36:17 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
3 3 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Tue 05/13 9:18 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/13 9:14 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tayron Deshawn Thomas. (bmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 mot2255 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 Tue 05/13 9:12 AM
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 5:22-CR-065-H) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmh)
Related: [-]
qcref Hendrix Tue 05/13 9:16 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 05/13 9:20 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3. Tue May 13 09:20:33 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]