Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Bir
Case #: 0:25-cv-60941
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 12:09 PM EDT
Defendant
HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. d/b/a/ THE HOME DEPOT
WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP 100 Southeast Second Street - Suite 2100
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alan Fiedel
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP 100 Southeast Second Street - Suite 2100
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alan Fiedel
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Plaintiff
STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY
COZEN O'CONNOR 200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3000
Miami, FL 33131


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
8 8 motion Substitution of Counsel Mon 05/19 11:58 AM
Unopposed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Alan Fiedel for Martin Buckley by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Responses due by 6/2/2025.(Fiedel, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/19 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Fiedel on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Fiedel, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
6 6 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/19 8:15 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch for Scheduling Conference, and Setting Trial Date. ( Calendar Call set for 1/21/2026 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 1/26/2026 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/14 10:08 AM
Joint Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent THE HOME DEPOT, INC., Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Fiedel, Alan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/14 10:03 AM
Joint Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Fiedel, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/13 1:52 PM
Defendants' Joint ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Fiedel, Alan)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 05/13 1:27 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Tue 05/13 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ). No Answer Filed/No Motion to Dismiss FIled. Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18444313, filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. d/b/a/ THE HOME DEPOT, SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC..(Fiedel, Alan) Modified text on 5/13/2025 (jas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 111 pgs Exhibit Ex. A - (S&C),
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B (Broward Court) Part 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. B (Broward Court) Part 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. C (Notice of Removal to OC),
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. D (Notice of Removal to the State Ct. Clerk)