Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:James D Peterson
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:25-cv-00382
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 11:11 AM CDT
Defendant
Columbia County, Wisconsin
Defendant
Timothy Larson
Defendant
Jeff Ocwieja
Defendant
Brenda Yaskal
Plaintiff
Quentin Wilke
P.O. Box 127
Madison, WI 53701

GPO May 13 2025
ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 5/13/2025. (jef),(ps)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 order Initial Pro Se Order on ifp Tue 05/13 10:23 AM
ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 5/13/2025. (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
misc Notice RE Unsigned Document Tue 05/13 9:58 AM
Notice to plaintiff regarding1 Complaint and3 Affidavit: The court has docketed this submission, however they are not signed as required by Rule 11(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Please sign the documents and promptly resubmit. (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 respm Affidavit Tue 05/13 9:47 AM
Affidavit of Quentin Wilke filed by Plaintiff Quentin Wilke re:2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/13 9:45 AM
Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Quentin Wilke. (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 9:44 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Quentin Wilke. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2025: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope