California Eastern District Court
Judge:Barbara A Mcauliffe
Case #: 1:25-cv-00562
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
6 6 3 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/14 8:11 AM
ORDER STRIKING1 ,2 ,3 ,4 Unsigned Filings; ORDER to Submit Signed Complaint and Signed Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/13/2025. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application-Non Prisoner,
Att: 2 Complaint Form,
Att: 3 ECF Registration Form
service Service by Mail Wed 05/14 8:12 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Order served on Olufolajimi Abegunde. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
5 5 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Tue 05/13 11:27 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/16/2025. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
service Service by Mail Tue 05/13 11:28 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Olufolajimi Abegunde. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/13 9:09 AM
MOTION for Order Directing Service of the Summons and Complaint by Olufolajimi Abegunde. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/13 8:55 AM
MOTION for E-Filing Access by Olufolajimi Abegunde. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/13 8:51 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Olufolajimi Abegunde. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Tue 05/13 8:50 AM
(1331) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against United States of America by Olufolajimi Abegunde. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet