Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:25-cv-80578
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Great American Assurance Company
Plaintiff
Everlong, LLC
Coconut Grove, FL 33133
Represented By
Andrew Mitchell Moss
Kutner Rubinoff & Moss PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 05/16 11:37 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Fri 05/16 9:15 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery; Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/15/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE filing Civil Cover Sheet by Everlong, LLC (Moss, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Tue 05/13 2:04 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (gqa)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 05/13 2:03 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Everlong, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18445039, filed by Everlong, LLC.(Moss, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A -- Consent Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B -- Settlement & Assignment,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C -- Insurance Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D -- ROR letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E -- Declination of Coverage,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. -- Notice of Appearance