Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarala V Nagala
Case #: 3:25-cv-00777
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 3:05 PM EDT
Defendant
Cartright Association
Defendant
Chase Cards
Defendant
Florida Dept of Labor
Defendant
JWB Property Management
Defendant
Jacksonville Housing Authority
Defendant
CT Dept of Labor
Defendant
Microsoft
Defendant
Nike
Defendant
Stratford Housing Authority
Plaintiff
Lamar Williams
25 Cartright Street, Unit 4B
Bridgeport, CT 06604


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
11 11 order Order Wed 05/14 5:18 PM
ORDER. The Court intends to issue an order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed prior to service. Accordingly, the Clerk's Office shall not issue any summonses in this action until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 5/14/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/14 5:17 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 5/14/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Wed 05/14 5:16 PM
ORDER. The Clerk is directed to add a defendant, Howard, to the case caption, as this individual is listed as a defendant in Plaintiff's complaint. See ECF No. 1 at 2. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 5/14/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
8 8 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Wed 05/14 1:12 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Wed 05/14 1:11 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 5/13/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 05/14 1:10 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 5/13/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Wed 05/14 1:09 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2025 Discovery due by 11/12/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2025 Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Tue 05/13 2:54 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2025. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Consent to Electronic Notice Tue 05/13 2:53 PM
Consent to Electronic Notice by Lamar Williams (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/13 2:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lamar Williams. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Cartright Association, Chase Cards, Florida Dept of Labor, Jacksonville Housing Authority, CT Dept of Labor, Microsoft, Nike, Stratford Housing Authority, JWB Property Management, filed by Lamar Williams. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Tue 05/13 3:16 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Sarala V. Nagala assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish. Related [+]
Related: [-] is, J