Texas Northern District Court
Judge:A Joe Fish
Case #: 3:25-cv-01207
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 2:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Mike Hammer
Defendant
Marco Rubio
Washington, DC 20522
Defendant
U.S. Embassy in Havana, Cuba
Defendant
United States Department of State
The Executive Office Office of the Legal Adviser 600 19th Street NW Suite 5.600
Washington, DC 20522
Plaintiff
Grisel Sulema Dominguez Gonzalez
Represented By
James O Hacking, III
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
6 6 misc Designation of Lead Counsel Fri 05/16 4:26 PM
Designation of lead counsel James O Hacking, III for Plaintiff Grisel Sulema Dominguez Gonzalez. (Hacking, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
5 5 order Order Thu 05/15 9:02 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, no later than May 30, 2025, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/15/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 2:49 PM
Summons issued as to Mike Hammer, Marco Rubio, US Embassy in Havana Cuba, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Fish Tue 05/13 2:47 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 05/13 1:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grisel Sulema Dominguez Gonzalez. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hacking, James) (Main Document 2 flattened on 5/13/2025) (kcr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Mike Hammer, Marco Rubio, U.S. Embassy in Havana, Cuba, United States Department of State filed by Grisel Sulema Dominguez Gonzalez. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15495372) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hacking, James) (Attachment 1 flattened on 5/13/2025) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons DOS,
Att: 3 Summons Embassy,
Att: 4 Summons SOS,
Att: 5 Summons Ambassador,
Att: 6 Summons US Atty.,
Att: 7 Summons Atty. General