California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Chi Soo Kim
Case #: 2:25-cv-01350
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 2:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Credit Control Services, Inc.
Plaintiff
Adrian Blanco
Represented By
Ely Grinvald
Ely Grinvald
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/19 9:13 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Credit Control Services, Inc. served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025.(Grinvald, Ely)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 misc Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order (Civil) for TLN Tue 05/13 1:09 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Tue 05/13 1:08 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Credit Control Services, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ely Grinvald, Esq.* *2355 Westwood Blvd., Suite 562* *Los Angeles, CA 90064*. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/13 12:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Adrian Blanco. (Grinvald, Ely)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 12:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Credit Control Services, Inc. by Adrian Blanco. Attorney Grinvald, Ely added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12216300) (Grinvald, Ely)
Related: [-]