Johnson v. Illinois Department of Corrections et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Mihm |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-03130 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
order
Order
Fri 05/16 4:04 PM
Text Only Order entered by United States District Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/16/2025. Plaintiff has filed a number of exhibits to his Complaint. Certain exhibits contain personal information that is generally not publicly docketed. The Clerk is to seal the exhibits that include this information.(GL) |
||
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Exhibits re1 Complaint by Sterling Johnson.(GL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - Exhibit 1 to Complaint (containing personal identifiers). (GL) |
|
Tuesday, May 13, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Sterling Johnson. Responses due by 5/27/2025 (KE) |
|
3 | 3
![]() PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Sterling Johnson.(KE) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 6/2/2025.(KE) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sterling Johnson.(KE) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |