California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:25-cv-04130
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Case in other court:Alameda Superior Court, 25CV116109
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 6:04 PM PDT
Defendant
Vistra Corporate Services Company
Defendant
Vistra Corp.
Defendant
Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Defendant
Moss Landing Power Company, LLC
Defendant
Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC
Defendant
LG Energy Solution, Ltd.
Defendant
LG Energy Solution Vertech, Inc.
Defendant
Dynegy Operating Company
Defendant
LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc.
Defendant
LG Energy Solution Arizona, Inc.
Defendant
L.G. Energy Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Nicole Jackson
an individual Law Offices of James B. Chanin 3050 Shattuck Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94705
Plaintiff
Shelton Harris
Plaintiff
Devin Jackson Harris
Plaintiff
Omar Garcia
Plaintiff
Griselda Campos
Plaintiff
Richard Cameron
Plaintiff
Alfonso Aguilar Lopez
Plaintiff
Leticia Acevedo
Plaintiff
Jesse Acevedo
Plaintiff
Jeremiah Acevedo
Plaintiff
Fernando Partida
Plaintiff
Enrique Rosiles
Plaintiff
Isabella Acevedo
Plaintiff
Hazel Acevedo
Plaintiff
Belen Acevedo


Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
18 18 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 05/14 12:41 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2025 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 05/14 8:35 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
16 16 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 05/13 10:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific Gas and Electric Company re6 Notice (Other),11 Certificate of Interested Entities Notice of Consent to Removal and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Kim, Miriam)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/13 8:04 PM
NOTICE by LG Energy Solution, Ltd., LG Energy Solution Arizona, Inc., LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc., LG Energy Solution Vertech, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,,, Notice of Consent to Notice of Removal (Boozell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 05/13 7:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC re4 Certificate of Interested Entities,5 Certificate of Interested Entities,13 Notice (Other),1 Notice of Removal,,,3 Certificate of Interested Entities,12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20674306.),2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Hudson, Abbey)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/13 7:13 PM
NOTICE by Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC of Pendency of Related Actions (Hudson, Abbey)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/13 7:08 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20674306.) filed by Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC.(Raiff, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
11 11 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/13 7:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacific Gas and Electric Company (FRCP 7.1) and Certificate of Interested Parties (Kim, Miriam)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 05/13 6:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Virginia Larimore Somaweera on behalf of Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC (Somaweera, Virginia)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 05/13 6:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Deena Klaber on behalf of Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC (Klaber, Deena)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 05/13 6:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Winston Y Chan on behalf of Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC (Chan, Winston)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 05/13 6:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Peter Spett Modlin on behalf of Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC (Modlin, Peter)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/13 6:49 PM
NOTICE by Pacific Gas and Electric Company re1 Notice of Removal,,, NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Kim, Miriam)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/13 6:49 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Moss Landing Energy Storage 1, LLC for Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company. (Hudson, Abbey)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/13 6:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vistra Corp. for Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Vistra Corporate Services Company; Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Vistra Corp.. (Hudson, Abbey)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/13 6:33 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement (Hudson, Abbey)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Tue 05/13 6:24 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Vistra Corp., Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC, Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC.(Hudson, Abbey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation Regarding Vistra Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Declaration of Yuki Whitmire,
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 05/13 6:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is 25CV116109. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20674051). Filed by Vistra Corporate Services Company, Dynegy Operating Company, Vistra Corp., Moss Landing Energy Storage 3, LLC, Moss Landing Power Company, LLC.(Hudson, Abbey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brad Masek,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Masek Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration of Yuki Whitmire,
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Whitmire Declaration (REDACTED),
Att: 5 Declaration of Abbey Hudson,
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Hudson Declaration - Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit B to Hudson Declaration - Summons,
Att: 8 Exhibit C to Hudson Declaration - Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Exhibit D to Hudson Declaration - State Court Filings,
Att: 10 Exhibit E to Hudson Declaration - Zillow Home Values Index,
Att: 11 Declaration of Jae Hong Park,
Att: 12 Exhibit A to Park Declaration,
Att: 13 Exhibit B to Park Declaration,
Att: 14 Exhibit C to Park Declaration