New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Referred: Barbara C Moses
Case #: 1:25-cv-03836
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331bc Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 1:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Plaintiff
Sarah Elizabeth Pillai
59 East 118th Street #2
New York, NY 10035


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
7 7 motion Permission for Electronic Case Filing Fri 05/16 12:40 PM
MOTION for Permission for Sarah Elizabeth Pillai to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Sarah Elizabeth Pillai.(yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/13 5:19 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 5/13/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Tue 05/13 11:21 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 03/18/2024) (sac)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Tue 05/13 11:20 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 11:15 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (sac)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Tue 05/13 11:15 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Sarah Elizabeth Pillai consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Sarah Elizabeth Pillai. (sac)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/13 10:49 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number 39715) Document filed by Sarah Elizabeth Pillai.. (sac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Main Document_Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Main Document_Part 2
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/13 10:53 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 05/13 10:53 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sac)
Related: [-]