New York Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Karas
Case #: 7:25-cv-04032
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 1:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Brook + Whittle, Inc.
20 Carter Drive
Guilford, CT 06437
Plaintiff
Ms. AnneMarie Campbell
1 Landmark Square #416
Port Chester, NY 10573
Represented By
Rita Costabile Tobin
Rctobinlaw, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/14 4:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Brook + Whittle, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2025, answer due 7/14/2025. Document filed by AnneMarie Campbell..(Tobin, Rita)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/14 12:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brook + Whittle, Inc., re:4 Complaint,. Document filed by AnneMarie Campbell..(Tobin, Rita)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Wed 05/14 12:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Brook + Whittle, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31079557)Document filed by AnneMarie Campbell.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Resume,
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Annual Review (2023),
Att: 4 Affidavit Affidavit of James Campell (dated/submitted to EEOC, 12/20/2024).(Tobin, Rita
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/14 11:17 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tobin, Rita)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 05/14 12:07 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 05/14 12:08 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 05/14 12:09 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 05/14 12:09 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rita Costabile Tobin to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 05/14 12:10 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rita Costabile Tobin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:451; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000; the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/14 12:14 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Rita Costabile Tobin to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name listed on the ECF docket text contains a typographical error; party name listed on the PDF 'To' field does not match party name listed on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/13 10:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brooks + Whittle, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by AnneMarie Campbell..(Tobin, Rita)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 10:28 PM
COMPLAINT against AnneMarie Campbell. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31076186)Document filed by AnneMarie Campbell..(Tobin, Rita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Form JS 44C/SDNY 12/04/2024,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. 1 EEOC Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. 2 AnneMarie Campbell Resume,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. 3 AnneMarie Campbell Annual Performance Review, 2023,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. 4 James Campbell Affidavit, submitted to EEOC 12/20/2024