New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Orelia E Merchant
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:25-cv-02610
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 1:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Valor Intelligent Processing, Inc.
Defendant
Verizon Communication Inc.
Plaintiff
Jennifer Pauyo
979 East 38th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11210


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
5 5 order Order(Other) Fri 05/16 3:28 PM
ORDER re1 Complaint filed by Jennifer Pauyo. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from May 9, 2025 to serve defendants and file proof of proper service with the Court. Accordingly, if proper service is not made upon defendants by August 7, 2025, or if plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been made by that date, I shall recommend that the Court should dismiss the action without prejudice. For information regarding court procedures, plaintiff may contact the Pro Se Office at the United States Courthouse by calling (718) 613-2665. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 5/16/2025. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 05/13 5:50 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 5:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Valor Intelligent Processing, Inc., Verizon Communication Inc.. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 05/13 5:48 PM
FILING FEE: $ 405.00, receipt number 10020799 (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 5:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Valor Intelligent Processing, Inc., Verizon Communication Inc., filed by Jennifer Pauyo. (KD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet