Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:25-cv-00587
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 1:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Dave Allen
Defendant
Richard Boos
Defendant
Pete Chrustowski
Defendant
Ronnie Wilberham
Plaintiff
Renee A. Chrustowski
711 Wood Duck Ct.
Middletown, DE 19709


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/15 10:32 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/15/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff*** (mws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/14 10:15 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 05/13 8:47 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint - Pro Se Non-Prisoner Tue 05/13 8:46 AM
COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Dave Allen, Richard Boos, Pete Chrustowski, Ronnie Wilberham - filed by Renee A. Chrustowski.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/13 8:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Renee A. Chrustowski.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
utility Remark Tue 05/13 8:52 AM
Remark: A Magistrate Consent Form, Acknowledgment of Receipt of Magistrate Consent Form, and Pro-Se Privacy Notice have been mailed to the Plaintiff. (mpb)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 05/13 11:13 AM
Remark: A Summons directed to Richard Boos and a Subpoena to Appear and Testify directed to Richard Boos and Ronnie Wilberham were received and placed in the case jacket. Both the Summons and Subpoena are missing the Court's seal and Deputy Clerk's signature. The Proof of Service Page indicates that the Plaintiff mailed the Summons and Subpoena to Richard Boos by USPS. (mpb)
Related: [-]