Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:25-cv-00589
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 12, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order - PLRA for Pay Authorization Thu 05/15 4:15 PM
ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $7.50 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/16/2025.). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/15/2025. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Authorization
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/14 10:42 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 05/13 10:23 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint - Prisoner 1983 Tue 05/13 10:22 AM
COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Brian Emig - filed by Nakia U. Wiggins.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
2 2 misc PLRA - Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 05/13 10:21 AM
Trust Fund Account Statement by Nakia U. Wiggins (mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/13 10:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Nakia U. Wiggins.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
utility Remark Tue 05/13 10:24 AM
Remark: Courtesy Copy of D.I.1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and first page of D.I.2 Certified Trust Fund Account Statement were received and placed in the case jacket. (mpb)
Related: [-]