Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:25-cv-00593
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 12, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order - PLRA Missing Documents Fri 05/16 3:01 PM
ORDER: Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit IFP application and trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/16/2025. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 05/16/2025. (oam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/14 10:58 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/13 1:17 PM
MOTION for Service by the U.S. Marshals - filed by Donald D. Parkell.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
7 7 2 pgs motion Certify Class Tue 05/13 1:12 PM
MOTION to Certify Class - filed by Donald D. Parkell.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 05/13 1:10 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Donald D. Parkell.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
5 5 misc Exhibit to a Document Tue 05/13 11:37 AM
[SEALED] Part C to4 Complaint - filed by Donald D. Parkell. (mpb)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint - Prisoner 1983 Tue 05/13 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Ceresini, John Doe 1-100, Stan Taylor - filed by Donald D. Parkell.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Tue 05/13 11:31 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - filed by Donald D. Parkell.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
2 2 motion Seal Tue 05/13 11:30 AM
MOTION to File Portion of the Complaint Under Seal and Temporary Restraining Order - filed by Donald D. Parkell.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/13 11:28 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Donald D. Parkell.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
utility Remark Tue 05/13 1:19 PM
Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (mpb)
Related: [-]