Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Referred: Regina D Cannon
Case #: 1:25-cv-02649
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 1:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By
Zachary Andrew McEntyre
contact info
Thomas Hanie Paris, IV
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Singh
Represented By
Craig Edward Bertschi
Mcrae Bertschi & Cole LLC
contact info
Hashim Rahman
Rahman Legal
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/15 9:10 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Equifax Information Services LLC Answer due 6/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 5/15/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Wed 05/14 11:21 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services LLC.(McEntyre, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/14 11:12 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. (McEntyre, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
2 2 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 05/13 4:18 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Hashim Rahman. Clerk to follow-up by 5/23/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 05/13 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-14291477)(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet