North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 5:25-cv-00249
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 1:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Nathaniel M. Knust
Defendant
Christy E. Wilhelm
Defendant
Herbert J. White
Defendant
Brad Urban
Defendant
Karen Swinehart
Defendant
Dr. Cynthia Sortisio
Defendant
Robert Shields
Defendant
Kristin Ruth
Defendant
Vinston Rozier
Defendant
Phillip Powe
Defendant
Paul C. Pittman
Defendant
Dr. Linda Norris
Defendant
Meredith S. Nicholson
Defendant
Stephen Marino
Defendant
Trystan Jordan
Defendant
Donna Hedgepeth Johnson
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Evonne S. Hopkins
Defendant
George R. Hicks, III
Defendant
Randell Hastings
Defendant
Margaret P. Eagles
Defendant
John T. Crook
Defendant
Tyler Burns
Defendant
Matthew Bledsoe
Defendant
Julie L. Bell
Defendant
Sydney Batch
Plaintiff
Amy Hendricks Palacios
3832 Grovesner St.
Harrisburg, NC 28075
Plaintiff
Edyta Hanna Basista
3832 Grovesner St.
Harrisburg, NC 28075


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/22 3:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed - Nathaniel M. Knust served on 5/15/2025, answer due 6/5/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/22 3:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed - Christy E. Wilhelm served on 5/15/2025, answer due 6/5/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion to Seal Document Thu 05/22 2:42 PM
ORDER denying 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; granting 9 Motion to Seal 8 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit; granting 10 Motion to Seal Documents. The clerk is DIRECTED to maintain docket entries 7-1, 7-2, 7-3, 7-4, 7-5, and 8 under seal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/22/2025. Copy sent via US mail to Plaintiff Amy Palacios. ( Pro se party Basista has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. ) (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing Thu 05/22 2:11 PM
Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party Edyta Hanna Basista has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/21 5:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed - Randell Hastings served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/21 5:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed - Matthew Bledsoe served on 5/13/2025, answer due 6/3/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/21 5:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed - Herbert J. White served on 5/14/2025, answer due 6/4/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
15 15 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 05/20 1:10 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Cararrus County Sheriff's Office as to Brad Urban. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter - no service at address,
Att: 2 Copy of Suit Documents,
Att: 3 Envelope Cabarrus County Sheriff
Friday, May 16, 2025
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/20 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed - Sydney Batch served on 5/15/2025, answer due 6/5/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/20 1:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed - Margaret P. Eagles served on 5/15/2025, answer due 6/5/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/20 1:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed - Linda Norris served on 5/15/2025, answer due 6/5/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/20 12:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed - Karen Swinehart served on 5/15/2025, answer due 6/5/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
10 10 motion Seal Document Wed 05/14 9:40 AM
MOTION to Seal TRO Contents7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Edyta Hanna Basista, Amy Hendricks Palacios. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
9 9 motion Seal Tue 05/13 3:30 PM
MOTION to Seal8 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by Edyta Hanna Basista, Amy Hendricks Palacios. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Copy of Defendant's motion to dismiss, motion for sanctions and attorney's fees from Wake County case
8 8 misc PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit Tue 05/13 3:28 PM
PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit filed by Edyta Hanna Basista, Amy Hendricks Palacios. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2- Copy of order in case 5:24-cv-686-BO
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Tue 05/13 3:26 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Edyta Hanna Basista, Amy Hendricks Palacios. (Rudd, D.) Modified on 5/13/2025 to correct the filed date. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Consent Order for Temporary Child Custody (Wake County Case 20-CVD-12899),
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Income Withholding for Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Petition for Termination of Parental Rights,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Declarations of Edyta Basista and Amy Palacios,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Order Modifying Custody & Visitation
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 3:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Sydney Batch, Julie L. Bell, Matthew Bledsoe, Tyler Burns, John T. Crook, Margaret P. Eagles, Randell Hastings, George R. Hicks, III, Evonne S. Hopkins, Donna Hedgepeth Johnson, Trystan Jordan, Nathaniel M. Knust, Stephen Marino, Meredith S. Nicholson, Linda Norris, Paul C. Pittman, Phillip Powe, Vinston Rozier, Kristin Ruth, Robert Shields, Cynthia Sortisio, Karen Swinehart, Brad Urban, Herbert J. White, Christy E. Wilhelm. (Summonses issued at intake). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 05/13 3:02 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Amy Hendricks Palacios. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 05/13 3:01 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Edyta Hanna Basista. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Self-Representation Tue 05/13 2:59 PM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Amy Hendricks Palacios. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Self-Representation Tue 05/13 2:58 PM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Edyta Hanna Basista. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number 5-00016829.), filed by Amy Hendricks Palacios, Edyta Hanna Basista. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet for Edyta H. Basista,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet for Amy H. Palacios