Texas Western District Court
Judge:Orlando L Garcia
Referred: Elizabeth S Chestney
Case #: 5:25-cv-00521
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 12:14 AM CDT
Defendant
John Does 1-20
Defendant
District Judge Laura Salinas
Defendant
Judge Robert J. Valdespino
Plaintiff
Henry B. Berrocal
8402 Timber Belt
San Antonio, TX 78250


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/16 4:24 PM
MOTION for Alternative Service and Waiver of Formal Service of Summons by Henry B. Berrocal.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 4 pgs order Order Wed 05/14 7:16 AM
STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Garcia. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Garcia's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) . Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (r013)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/14 1:44 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Wed 05/14 1:41 PM
ORDER DENYING2 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Case Opening Letter Tue 05/13 9:26 AM
Case Opening Letter to Henry B. Berrocal. (tt)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 9:23 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (tt)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 05/13 9:22 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Henry B. Berrocal. (tt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 9:07 AM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 7595), filed by Henry B. Berrocal.. (tt) (***There was no document listed as Exhibit B.***)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Receipt