California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:25-cv-04105
Nature of Suit871 Federal Tax Suits - IRS-Third Party 26 USC 7609
Cause26:7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Case Filed:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Petitioner
Andrea Tirelli
Represented By
Andrew DePue Allen
Allen Tax Law, Apc
contact info
Respondent
United States of America


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/15 11:50 AM
ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE - Response to Petition due by 6/11/2025. Reply due by 6/25/2025. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2025 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/15/2025. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Summons Issued as to USA Tue 05/13 1:58 PM
Summons Issued as to United States of America., Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/13 1:39 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 05/13 1:27 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/13/2025. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 05/13 9:32 AM
Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Allen, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 PETITION to Quash IRS Summons against United States of America (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20668894). Filed by Andrea Tirelli.(Allen, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D