California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:25-cv-04132
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 12:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Langer Juice Company, Inc.
Plaintiff
David E Robinson
Represented By
Bahar Sodaify
Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 05/14 1:30 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by David E Robinson [PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS] (Sodaify, Bahar)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 05/14 8:57 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 05/14 8:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Langer Juice Company, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 05/14 8:25 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/27/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 05/13 8:19 PM
Proposed Summons. (Sodaify, Bahar)
Related: [-]
1 1 45 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 8:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Langer Juice Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20674371.). Filed by David E Robinson.(Sodaify, Bahar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration OF BAHAR SODAIFY REGARDING VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1780(d),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet