Comet ML Inc. v. Perplexity AI, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-04088 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2025 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 8:04 PM PDT |
Defendant
Perplexity AI, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Comet ML Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 8/11/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2025, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 15, 2025, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (eac, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, May 14, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Marissa B. Lewis); Finding as Moot 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (eac, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, May 13, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Summons Issued as to Perplexity AI, Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . (hdj, COURT STAFF) |
|
14 | 14
![]() MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 6 ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20667181.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/12/2025 filed by Comet ML Inc.. (Lewis, Marissa) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Tue 05/13 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Marissa Brooke Lewis on behalf of Comet ML Inc. (Lewis, Marissa) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER SETTING SPECIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Edward J. Davila Denying 8 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 5/20/2025. Defendant's Response due by 5/27/2025. Plaintiff's Reply due by 5/30/2025. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/10/2025, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (eac, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 05/13 10:45 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 05/13 9:59 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 05/13 9:10 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/27/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Eleanor M. Lackman on behalf of Comet ML Inc. (Lackman, Eleanor) | |
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |