California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:25-cv-04059
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 12:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Roger J. Buffington
Defendant
Buffington Law Firm, PC
Defendant
Hitchman Fiduciaries, LLC
Defendant
Stephen M. Paul
Plaintiff
Sheryl Moulton
650 Castro Street, Suite 120 PMB 94976
Mountain View, CA 94041


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/13 1:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Roger J. Buffington, Buffington Law Firm, PC, Hitchman Fiduciaries, LLC, Stephen M. Paul. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 05/13 1:30 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2025 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/13 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Roger J. Buffington, Buffington Law Firm, PC, Hitchman Fiduciaries, LLC, Stephen M. Paul (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 511019439). Filed by Sheryl Moulton. Consent/Declination due by 5/23/2025. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Filing fee receipt