Original Case: 4:21-cv-00737

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01946
Typecivil / united states as a party
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 3:46 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
United States of America
Represented By
Gregory E. Van Hoey
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Elisabeth Kryska
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Brij Patnaik
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Christopher J. Rajotte
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By
Dwight Mersereau
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info
David Blair
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info
David J. Fischer
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info
Jonathan Barton Potts
BRYAN & CAVE
contact info
Caroline Claudia Setliffe
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info
Sarah Paul
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By
Dwight Mersereau
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info
David Blair
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info
David J. Fischer
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info
Jonathan Barton Potts
BRYAN & CAVE
contact info
Caroline Claudia Setliffe
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info
Sarah Paul
EVERSHEDS & SUTHERLAND
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 3:46 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
5 pgs Civil case docketed. [5516134] 25-1946 (RDB)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 2/24/2025, Order dated 3/18/2025, Judgment dated 3/18/2025 [5516141] 25-1946 (RDB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Appendix due on 06/23/2025. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. due 06/23/2025.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5516144] 25-1946 (RDB)
Related: [-]