District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Loren L Alikhan
Case #: 1:25-cv-01455
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:May 14, 2025
Case in other court:Connecticut, 3:24-cv-01740
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 9:04 AM EDT
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Plaintiff
NATIONAL SHOOTING SPORTS FOUNDATION
Represented By
Matthew D. Hardin
Hardin Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/14 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
18 18 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 05/14 8:50 AM
Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:24-cv-01740. Original file ,transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
17 17 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The court thanks the parties for their timely status report, ECF No.16 , in which they jointly request that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The court grants that request pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 1404(a), finding transfer to be in the interest of judicial efficiency and for the convenience of the parties and likely witnesses. The Clerk of Court is asked, respectfully, to please effect the transfer. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/1/25. (Wagner, R) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Lewis, D) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
16 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by National Shooting Sports Foundation. (Hardin, Matthew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
15 15 STATUS REPORT ORDER. The court notes that an answer has been filed in this case, but before the change of administration in the executive branch, and that there has been no further activity for several months. Accordingly, the parties are instructed to file a status report on or before April 30, 2025, indicating whether there remains a dispute requiring court intervention, and if so, proposing a mutually agreeable litigation schedule. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 4/7/25. (Wagner, R) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 4/30/2025 (Lewis, D) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
14 14 ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by U.S. Department of the Interior.(Orticelli, Jillian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE of Related Case by U.S. Department of the Interior (Orticelli, Jillian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Rose Orticelli on behalf of U.S. Department of the Interior (Orticelli, Jillian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 02, 2024
11 11 Supplemental CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Shooting Sports Foundation re8 Standing Order re: Letters,9 Electronic Service Documents,,7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,5 Electronic Filing Order,6 Standing Protective Order(Hardin, Matthew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Service of ECF Nos. 5 through 9
Friday, November 01, 2024
10 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Shooting Sports Foundation re9 Electronic Service Documents,,(Hardin, Matthew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service Package,
Att: 2 Certified Mail Receipts / Tracking Numbers
9 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,8 Standing Order re: Letters,2 Disclosure Statement filed by National Shooting Sports Foundation,1 Complaint, filed by National Shooting Sports Foundation,7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,5 Electronic Filing Order,6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/1/2024.(Imbriani, S) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/1/2024.(Imbriani, S) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Imbriani, S) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/1/2024.(Imbriani, S) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/1/2024.(Imbriani, S) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *U.S. Department of the Interior* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Matthew Hardin Hardin Law Office* *1725 I Street NW, Suite 300* *Washington, DC 20006*. (Pesta, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/1/24.(Hushin, Z.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Disclosure Statement by National Shooting Sports Foundation. (Hardin, Matthew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Under the Freedom of Information Act against U.S. Department of the Interior ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7954905.), filed by National Shooting Sports Foundation.(Hardin, Matthew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (FOIA request),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (FOIA portal screenshot),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Oct. 31, 2024 letter denying expedited processing),
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to U.S. Department of the Interior. (30 day summons per FOIA) (Hardin, Matthew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]