Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 5:25-cv-02453
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332(d)(5)(B) Diversity of Citizenship under CAFA
Case Filed:May 14, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 3:09 PM EDT
Defendant
CDHA MANAGEMENT LLC
Defendant
CHORD SPECIALTY DENTAL PARTNERS
Defendant
SPARK DSO, LLC
Plaintiff
E.W.
Represented By
BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Shub Johns & Holbrook LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ROSEANN LABRAKE
Represented By
BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Shub Johns & Holbrook LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 05/20 10:25 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF MARIYA WEEKES, ESQ. (DOC. NO. 5) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/20/2025.5/20/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 05/19 3:42 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mariya Weekes ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18303805.) filed by E.W., ROSEANN LABRAKE.Certificate of Service.(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
4 4 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 05/16 6:13 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by E.W., ROSEANN LABRAKE.Certificate of Service, Memorandum.(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum ISO Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Shub Johns & Holbrook Resume,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Milberg Resume,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Golomb Legal Resume,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 15, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/15 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMANTHA E. HOLBROOK on behalf of E.W., ROSEANN LABRAKE with Certificate of Service(HOLBROOK, SAMANTHA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 05/14 3:58 PM
Summons Issued as to CDHA MANAGEMENT LLC, CHORD SPECIALTY DENTAL PARTNERS, SPARK DSO, LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/14/25 (mas)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 05/14 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18292111.), filed by ROSEANN LABRAKE.(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form