California Eastern District Court
Judge:Christopher D Baker
Case #: 1:25-cv-00569
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 14, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/15 1:47 PM
ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 5/15/2025. Within 45 days of the date of service of this order, Plaintiff shall submit the attached application to proceed in forma pauperis, completed and signed, or in the alternative, pay the $405.00 filing fee for this action . (Deputy Clerk OFR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application
service Service by Mail Thu 05/15 1:47 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order served on Christopher R. Castillo. (Deputy Clerk OFR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
3 3 misc Document(s) Served Electronically Wed 05/14 1:18 PM
DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY:2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Corcoran. (Deputy Clerk OFR)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Wed 05/14 1:13 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/14/2025*. Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days . (Deputy Clerk OFR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Consent,
Att: 2 E-Filing Notice
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Wed 05/14 1:12 PM
(1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against O. Duran, J. Lopez, D. Merdano, A. Ojeda, Perez, A. Quattorne, I. Ruan, R. Valero, M. Velasquez, A. Villapando by Christopher R. Castillo. (Deputy Clerk OFR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet