Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant
Case #: 4:25-cv-00512
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Case Filed:May 14, 2025
Case in other court:235th Judicial District Court of Cooke County, TX, CV23-00316
Last checked: Wednesday May 14, 2025 5:09 PM CDT
Defendant
KAG Leasing, Inc.
Defendant
KAG Specialty Products Group, LLC
Defendant
Brian Mueller
Defendant
Transport Resources, Inc.
Defendant
Yokohama Tire Corporation
Represented By
T Christopher Trent
Trent & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Laila Abedian


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/16 3:38 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 5/16/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/15 4:26 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against KAG Leasing Inc., KAG Specialty Products Group, LLC, Brian Mueller, Transport Resources Inc., Yokohama Tire Corporation, filed by Laila Abedian.(CLC)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/15 4:17 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to2 Complaint by KAG Leasing Inc.(CLC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 05/15 4:12 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CLC)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 05/15 4:27 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motion pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/15 4:25 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** FIRST AMENDED PETITION against KAG Leasing Inc., KAG Specialty Products Group, LLC, Brian Mueller, Transport Resources Inc., filed by Laila Abedian.(CLC)
Related: [-]
6 6 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 05/15 4:23 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint2 by KAG Specialty Products Group, LLC. (CLC)
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 05/15 4:21 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** First AMENDED ANSWER to2 Complaint by KAG Leasing Inc. (CLC)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/15 4:18 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to2 Complaint by Brian Mueller.(CLC)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 05/15 4:15 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against KAG Leasing Inc., Brian Mueller, Transport Resources Inc., filed by Laila Abedian.(CLC)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 05/14 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Yokohama Tire Corporation from 235th Judicial District Court of Cooke County, Texas, case number CV23-00316. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10839460), filed by Yokohama Tire Corporation.(Trent, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit R
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/15 4:12 PM
Case assigned to Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant. (CLC)
Related: [-]