New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:25-cv-04007
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331fr Fed. Question: Fraud
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 1:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Tether Operations Limited
Plaintiff
Xingshun Wen
4838 Glenwood St.
Little Neck, NY 11362


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
7 7 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Wed 05/14 11:43 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (sac)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Wed 05/14 11:42 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Wed 05/14 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/14 11:42 AM
MOTION re Request for Telephonic/Video Appearance. Document filed by Xingshun Wen. (sac)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/14 11:38 AM
MOTION re Request for Interpreter. Document filed by Xingshun Wen. (sac)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/14 11:36 AM
MOTION for alternative service re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Xingshun Wen.. (sac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit I,
Att: 2 Proposed Order re Email Service
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Wed 05/14 11:32 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Xingshun Wen consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Xingshun Wen. (sac)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/14 11:28 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Xingshun Wen. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/14 11:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Tether Operations Limited. Document filed by Xingshun Wen. (sac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 05/14 11:30 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]