Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:25-cv-02678
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 1:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Beverly Williams
1075 N Hariston Rd. Apt 12K
Stone Mountain, GA 30083
Defendant
and All Others
Plaintiff
Nissan Golden Gate LLC
P.O. BOx 83009
Conyers, GA 30013


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Sunday, May 18, 2025
5 5 12 pgs order Order Sun 05/18 10:16 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/18 10:17 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Nissan Golden Gate LLC and Beverly Williams as to Nissan Golden Gate LLC and Beverly Williams re5 Order. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 05/16 3:29 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 05/16/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP Fri 05/16 3:28 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal. The Court RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c). Defendants Application for Leave to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Doc.1 . As this is a final Report and Recommendation and there are no other matters pending before the Court, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 05/16/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/16 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. filed by Beverly Williams.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/16 3:36 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nissan Golden Gate LLC, Beverly Williams re4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,3 Final Report and Recommendation. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/14 9:15 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Beverly Williams.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/14 9:16 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (ajw)
Related: [-]