Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 1:25-cv-02690
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 14, 2025
Case in other court:New Mexico, 1:24-cv-01048
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 4:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Terry E. Bernard
Defendant
State Board of Pardons and Paroles
Defendant
State of Georgia
Plaintiff
Tavarres J. Henderson
1002250536 Valdosta State Prison P.O. Box 5368
Valdosta, GA 31603


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Wed 05/14 2:59 PM
ORDER for Service of5 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 5/14/2025. (dob)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Wed 05/14 2:55 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tavarres J. Henderson be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 5/14/2025. (dob)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 05/14 11:38 AM
Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:24-cv-01048. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/14 11:40 AM
Submission of2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,1 Complaint, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (aar)
Related: [-]
motion Report and Recommendation - Final Wed 05/14 2:58 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending1 Complaint filed by Tavarres J. Henderson be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the three strikes of the Prison Litigation Reform Act provision as found in5 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 5/14/2025. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/14 2:59 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tavarres J. Henderson re6 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tavarres J. Henderson. (dob)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
3 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER by District Judge Margaret I. Strickland. (gri) [Transferred from New Mexico on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tavarres Henderson. (dr) [Transferred from New Mexico on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tavarres Henderson. (dr) [Transferred from New Mexico on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
United States District Judge Margaret I. Strickland and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr) [Transferred from New Mexico on 5/14/2025.]
Related: [-]