Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Phyllis M Jones
Case #: 3:25-bk-11634
Case Filed:May 14, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Lyles Capital Management, LLC
3408 Oakmont Dr
Jonesboro, AR 72404-9502
Represented By
Joel G. Hargis
Caddell Reynolds
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Saturday, May 17, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/17 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order of Deficiency Corporate Resolution due 5/28/2025.
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 05/17 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditor Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors.
Thursday, May 15, 2025
4 4 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST) Thu 05/15 9:48 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. (Johnson, Kent)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Order of Deficiency Thu 05/15 9:28 AM
Order of Deficiency Corporate Resolution due 5/28/2025. (Jones, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
2 2 crditcrd Receipt (Auto) Wed 05/14 8:43 PM
RECEIPT of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:3:25-bk-11634] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. receipt number A16661095, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 05/14 8:42 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Lyles Capital Management, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/11/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 09/11/2025. (Hargis, Joel)
Related: [-]