Berrocal et al v. The State of Texas, bexar county unnamed officers et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Fred Biery |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00503 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 2:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Federal unnamed Marshall officers
|
|
Defendant
jail unnamed officer Badge #3088
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Attorney's Office (Western District of Texas)
|
|
Defendant
The State of Texas, bexar county unnamed officers
|
|
Defendant
Texas Attorney General
|
|
Defendant
Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sheriff Javier Salazar
|
|
Defendant
San Antonio code officers
|
|
Defendant
San Antonio Police Department
|
|
Defendant
KSAT News Station
|
|
Defendant
KSAT News
|
|
Defendant
Judge Peter Sakai
|
|
Defendant
Jail Officer A. Terrasas
|
|
Defendant
District Judge Stephanie Boyd
|
|
Defendant
District Judge Joel Perez
|
|
Defendant
District Judge Carlo Key Rodriguez
|
|
Defendant
City of San Antonio unnamed officers
|
|
Defendant
City of San Antonio Legal Department
|
|
Defendant
Chief of Police William McManus
|
|
Defendant
Anthony B. Cantrell
|
|
Defendant
Bexar county criminal court house
|
|
Defendant
Bexar County Adult Detention Center
|
|
Plaintiff
Humanity for Wisdom
8402 Timber Belt
San Antonio, TX 78250 |
|
Plaintiff
Elegant & Happy LLC.
8402 Timber Belt
San Antonio, TX 78250 |
|
Plaintiff
Cycle of Management LLC
8402 Timber Belt
San Antonio, TX 78250 |
|
Plaintiff
Henry B. Berrocal
8402 Timber Belt
San Antonio, TX 78250 |
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 14, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Henry B. Berrocal. (rqr) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Case Opening Letter TO Henry B. Berrocal, Cycle of Management LLC, Elegant & Happy LLC., Humanity for Wisdom. (dtg) |
|
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to Federal unnamed Marshall officers, Bexar County Adult Detention Center, Bexar county criminal court house, Anthony B. Cantrell, Chief of Police William McManus, District Judge Carlo Key Rodriguez, District Judge Joel Perez, District Judge Stephanie Boyd, Jail Officer A. Terrasas, Judge Peter Sakai, KSAT News Station, San Antonio Police Department, San Antonio code officers, Sheriff Javier Salazar, Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc., The State of Texas, bexar county unnamed officers, jail unnamed officer Badge #3088. (dtg) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405.00 receipt number 7562), filed by Elegant & Happy LLC., Henry B. Berrocal, Cycle of Management LLC, Humanity for Wisdom.(dtg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Wed 05/14 4:01 PM
2 USBs were submitted along with Complaint1 by Henry B. Berrocal. 1 USB forwarded to Judge Biery's Chambers and 1 USB placed in Clerk's file room.***USBs were scanned for viruses.*** (dtg) |