Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Beth Phillips
Case #: 5:24-cv-04209
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause05:7703 Discrimination - Review of Agency Act
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Case in other court:Boone County Circuit Court, 24BA-CV05029
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 10:04 PM CDT
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP
Represented By
Tracy M. Hayes
Sanders Warren & Russell Llp-Opks
contact info
Bradley S. Russell
Sanders Warren & Russell Llp-Opks
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By
Tracy M. Hayes
Sanders Warren & Russell Llp-Opks
contact info
Bradley S. Russell
Sanders Warren & Russell Llp-Opks
contact info
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
Tracy M. Hayes
Sanders Warren & Russell Llp-Opks
contact info
Bradley S. Russell
Sanders Warren & Russell Llp-Opks
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Morris
Represented By
Edward Emmett Keenan
Keenan & Bhatia, LLC
contact info
James R. Montgomery
Keenan & Bhatia, LLC
contact info
Aaron J Hadlow
Keenan & Bhatia
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayona Shifflett
201 South 8th Street
St. Joseph, MO 69501
Represented By
Edward Emmett Keenan
Keenan & Bhatia, LLC
contact info
James R. Montgomery
Keenan & Bhatia, LLC
contact info
Aaron J Hadlow
Keenan & Bhatia
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
29 29 utility Remark Wed 05/14 11:06 AM
***Remark: Pursuant to Doc. No.27 , division changed from Jefferson City to St. Jo. (TLM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
28 28 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (as to Pretrial Conference and Trial locations only): Pursuant to Order, (Doc. 27), the Pretrial Conference will be held in Courtroom 7A, at the federal courthouse in Kansas City on 7/10/26, at 10:00 AM. The Jury Trial set for 7/20/26 shall be held in Courtroom 7A at the federal courthouse in Kansas City. All other dates and deadlines remain set pursuant to the Scheduling Order, Doc. 15. Signed on 5/12/25 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (ALC)
Related: [-]
27 27 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE21 Defendants' motion to transfer or reassign the case to the St. Joseph Division is GRANTED. motion to reassign/transfer case. The caption and the case number shall reflect that this is a St. Joseph Division case. Any jury will be drawn in the manner utilized for St. Joseph Division cases, and the trial and will take place in Kansas City, Missouri. Signed on 5/12/25 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (ALC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
26 26 RESPONSE to motion re25 MOTION to stay filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 5/22/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
25 25 MOTION to stay filed by Aaron J Hadlow on behalf of Stephanie Morris, Kayona Shifflett. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hadlow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
24 24 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re21 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc.. Related [+] (Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-] 21
Friday, April 18, 2025
23 23 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re21 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Aaron J Hadlow on behalf of Plaintiffs Stephanie Morris, Kayona Shifflett. Reply suggestions due by 5/2/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Hadlow, Aaron)
Related: [-] 21
Monday, April 14, 2025
22 22 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Renee Henson(Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
21 21 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/18/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
20 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 2/25/25 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A to Protective Order
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
19 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kayona Shifflett, Stephanie Morris filed by Aaron J Hadlow on behalf of Plaintiffs Kayona Shifflett, Stephanie Morris.(Hadlow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/27/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
17 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Aaron J Hadlow on behalf of Plaintiffs Kayona Shifflett, Stephanie Morris.(Hadlow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
16 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Defendants Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP.(Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
15 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/23/2026. Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2026. Teleconference set for 6/26/2026 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2026 10:00 AM via teleconference. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2026 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 2/6/25 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
14 14 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Renee Henson(Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
13 13 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP. (Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
12 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Defendants Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP.(Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
11 11 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/18/2025. Rule 26 conference due by 2/4/2025. Signed on 1/8/25 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
10 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This case number shall now read: 2:24-cv-04209-BP. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
9 9 NOTICE of appearance by Aaron J Hadlow on behalf of Kayona Shifflett, Stephanie Morris (Hadlow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
8 8 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 11/26/2024 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
6 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Walmart Stores East filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
5 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Walmart Stores East I, LP filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP.(Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
4 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Walmart, Inc. filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
3 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP. (Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
2 2 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP.(Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Boone County, case number 24BA-CV05029, Filing fee $405, receipt number BMOWDC-9316000.(Hayes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 12/17/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]