Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:25-cv-01224
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:May 13, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
4 4 order Order Transferring to Another District ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 05/19 10:09 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: The Court, under Sections 1406(a) and 1631 and the undersigned's authority granted by Rule 2(a)(3) of the Court's Miscellaneous Order No. 6, will transfer the Section 2241 petition to that district on 6/9/2025 to allow Petitioner an opportunity to file an objection to Judge Brown within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. This case is stayed for 21 days pursuant to LR 62.2, clerk to calendar a reminder to transfer the case when the 21-day stay has elapsed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/19/2025) (kcr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 05/19 10:10 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon May 19 10:10:14 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 05/19 10:49 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Camilo Ortega Garcia. (knb)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 05/14 4:50 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed May 14 16:50:53 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
3 3 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 05/14 4:50 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Camilo Ortega Garcia. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (knb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Wed 05/14 4:49 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (knb)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Brown Wed 05/14 4:49 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]