California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kirk E Sherriff
Referred: Erica P Grosjean
Case #: 1:25-cv-00570
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Terminated:May 20, 2025
Case in other court:Fresno County Superior Court, 23CECG03206
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Samuel Lofty Confectioner
Defendant
Fresno Unified School District
Represented By
Joshua D. Milton
Berger Milton, Inc.
contact info
Bruce James Berger
Berger Milton, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John HJ Doe
Represented By
Morgan Alan Stewart
Manly, Stewart & Finaldi
contact info
Ariel Romero
Manly, Stewart & Finaldi
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
7 7 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Case Remanded Tue 05/20 10:21 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER to Remand Case to State Court, signed by District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff on 05/19/2025. REMANDING CASE to Fresno Superior Court. Certified copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 05/16 2:56 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Remand to State Court by Fresno Unified School District. (Berger, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 misc Civil New Case Documents for KES Wed 05/14 2:08 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Deputy Clerk JPX)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
4 4 utility Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/14 9:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Fresno Unified School District. (Berger, Bruce)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction Wed 05/14 8:19 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Bruce Berger re1 Notice of Removal: Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
2 2 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Fresno Unified School District. (Berger, Bruce)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 23CECG03206 by John HJ Doe. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12217485) (Berger, Bruce)
Related: [-]