California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:25-cv-01353
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 12, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
6 6 motion In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/20 3:18 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
4 4 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Wed 05/14 2:57 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/16/2025. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Litigant Letter
service Service by Mail Wed 05/14 2:58 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/16 2:30 PM
MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Deputy Clerk KS)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/14 2:57 PM
NOTICE re inability to E-file by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/14 2:54 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Wed 05/14 2:51 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]