California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:25-cv-01357
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 13, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
4 4 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 05/21 8:09 AM
PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jimmy Lee Houston. (Deputy Clerk JAW)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
misc Notice re IFP Submission Fri 05/16 4:20 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Jimmy Lee Houston, CDCR No. F-91926 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk KS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
3 3 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Wed 05/14 11:09 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/13/2025*. Consent or Decline due by 6/16/2025. (Deputy Clerk JAW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Litigant Letter,
Att: 2 E-Filing Notice
service Service by Mail Wed 05/14 11:11 AM
SERVICE BY EMAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Jimmy Lee Houston. (Deputy Clerk JAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/14 11:09 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jimmy Lee Houston. (Deputy Clerk JAW)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Wed 05/14 11:05 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jimmy Lee Houston. (Deputy Clerk JAW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet