Vazquez et al v. Zuffa, LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-05591 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:2 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 20, 2015 10:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Zuffa, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Lloyd Hallman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Javier Vazquez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
63 | 63
![]() Receipt of acknowledgment from District of Nevada. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
62 | 62
![]() ORDER granting 18 Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk shall TRANSFER the above-captioned actions to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada, Las Vegas Division, and close this court's files. All matters calendared before the undersigned are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/2/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
61 | 61
![]() ORDER Granting (91) Stipulation in case 5:14-cv-05484-EJD; Granting (60) Stipulation in case 5:14-cv-05591-EJD; Granting (60) Stipulation in case 5:14-cv-05621-EJD; Granting (37) Stipulation in case 5:15-cv-00521-EJD; Granting (32) Stipulation in case 5:15-cv-01324-EJD to STAY DISCOVERYPENDING RESOLUTION OF THE MOTION TO TRANSFER. Discovery will be stayed pending the resolution of the pending Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/1/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
60 | 60
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/29/2015) |