Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-cr-00682
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 2:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Jose Angel Martinez, Jr.
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alexa Dinsmore Parcell
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 4:33 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
Arrest of Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez, filed. (kll7) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. 8:1326 INITIAL APPEARANCE and PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION on Criminal Complaint as to Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez held on 3/26/2025. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Deft, through counsel, waived Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court found Probable Cause. Deft held without bond. Appearances: Samuel Lucas Delcolle, AUSA; Brian Buehler, AFPD. (PTS: Daisy Montemayor) (ERO: Christopher Barrera) (Interpreter: Gregorio Ayala/used) (DUSM: Martiza Pena ) Deft remanded to custody. (sg7) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jose Angel Martinez, Jr, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez, filed. (Martinez, Jose) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Alexa Dinsmore Parcell appearing for USA, filed. (Parcell, Alexa) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 3/26/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (egg7) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez, filed. (kll7) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (sg7) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (sg7) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (sg7) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez, filed. [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez, filed. (ah7) [7:25-mj-00601]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (le7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jose Antonio Chavez-Hernandez, filed. (le7)
Related: [-]