Delaware District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-00602
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 12:06 PM EDT
Defendant
Element Biosciences, Inc.
Plaintiff
Illumina Cambridge, Ltd.
Represented By
Kelly E. Farnan
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Illumina, Inc.
Represented By
Kelly E. Farnan
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
8 8 misc Multi Media Document Fri 05/16 3:47 PM
MULTI-MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Illumina Cambridge, Ltd., Illumina, Inc. in the form of a USB drive containing Exhibits 24-25 and 28-29 to the Complaint (D.I.1 ). Filing related to5 Notice of Filing Multi-Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 4:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illumina, Inc., Illumina Cambridge, Ltd..Element Biosciences, Inc. served on 5/15/2025, answer due 6/5/2025. (Farnan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 05/15 12:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Element Biosciences, Inc. on 5/15/2025. (oam)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials Thu 05/15 12:08 PM
NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: USB drive containing Exhibits 2425 and 2829 to the1 Complaint. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Kelly E. Farnan on behalf of Illumina Cambridge, Ltd., Illumina, Inc. (oam)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Thu 05/15 12:04 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Illumina, Inc. for Illumina Cambridge, Ltd.; Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Illumina, Inc., filed by Illumina Cambridge, Ltd., Illumina, Inc. (oam) Modified on 5/15/2025 (nms)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 05/15 12:00 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 12,151,241; 8,951,781; 11,117,130; 11,697,116 ; 12,251,702. (oam)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 05/15 11:59 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (oam)
Related: [-]
1 1 133 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/15 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Element Biosciences, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4687239) - filed by Illumina, Inc., Illumina Cambridge, Ltd..(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 393 pgs Exhibits 1-9,
Att: 2 91 pgs Exhibits 10-17,
Att: 3 247 pgs Exhibits 18-22,
Att: 4 137 pgs Exhibits 23-29,
Att: 5 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet